At Public Enterprise Selection Board (PESB) meeting held on 29 September, 2014, Atul Srivastava who is ED, SAIL has been selected for the post of Director (personnel) in Steel Authority…
Subscribe Now for Real-time Updates on the Latest Stories!
DCM Sriram Ltd appointed new Whole Time Director and Nominee Director of the Company. They are: K K Kaul has been appointed as Whole Time Director. Sharad Shrivastva has been…
Nova Iron & Steel Ltd has appointed Hardev Chand Verma as Whole-time Director of the company.
Ajoy Shah has been re-designated as Chief Financial Officer of Nova Iron & Steel Ltd.
Tata Metalinks Ltd announced that Dipak Banerjee has resigned as Independent Director of Tata Metaliks Ltd due to personal reasons.
Diligent Industries Ltd has appointed V V Vinod Kumar as an Additional Director of the company.
1. The 1997 batch Indian Ordnance Factory Service officer, Pramod Kumar Sahoo is expected to join central deputation at Deputy Secretary/Director level in Government of India. 2. The 1992 batch…
The 1996 batch IAS officer of Kerala cadre, Minhaj Alam, who was on inter-cadre deputation to Bihar and is completing his deputation tenure on July 4, 2014, has been repatriated…
D Sundarasekaran, GM, MFL, appointment as Director (technical), Madras Fertilizers Limited is being delayed by CVC.
Radhey Shyam, GM of South Eastern Railway (Kolkata), has been given an additional charge of Kolkata Metro due to the superannuation of Rajeev Bhargava on June 30.
The 1984 batch IAS officer of Gujarat cadre, P K Taneja has been given an additional charge of Additional Chief Secretary, Health & Family Welfare Department.
A number of Indian Administrative Service (IAS) officers have been transferred and posted at different places in Gujarat. Officers are: 1. Vijay Nehra has been appointed as Municipal Commissioner, Rajkot…
The 1984 batch IPS officer of Gujarat cadre, Rakesh Asthana may soon move on central deputation. Presently, serving in the state as Police Commissioner, Surat.
The 1988 batch IAS officer of Haryana cadre, T V S Prasad is likely to be appoint as new Joint Secretary in Ministry of Power in the Government of India.
The 1995 batch IPS officer of Uttar Pradesh cadre, Alok Singh has joined Air India as Executive Director, Security. He had served as PS to Union Home Minister Rajnath Singh…
Saurabh Kumar Mallick, Senior Deputy Accountant General (Admn), in the office Principal Accountant General (General & Social Sector Audit), Uttar Pradesh, Allahabad, has been promoted to the Senior Administrative Grade…
Guess words from 4 to 11 letters and create your own puzzles.
Create words using letters around the square.
Match elements and keep your chain going.
Play Historic chess games.
Sign in to your account